RUFFIN v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Petitioner: TRAVIS DEVON RUFFIN
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and YOUNG
Case Number: 3:2020cv05707
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (sdw)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:19-cv-81571. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ORDER Adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. The Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER Case No.: 19-cv-81571 to the appropriate division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE in this District and DENY all pending motions AS MOOT. Motions Terminated: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Travis Devon Ruffin Recommending that the Clerk of Court TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Middle D. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address (Address Previously Updated) by Travis Devon Ruffin (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re 8 Order, DE# 5 has been mailed to Travis Devon Ruffin #K81072 Santa Rosa Correctional Inst. Inmate Mail /Parcels 5850 East Milton Road Milton, FL 32583 (dj) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to mail Magistrate Judge Reid's Report and Recommendation (DE #5 ) to Petitioner at his new address, which is listed in DE #7 . Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/23/2020. (gts) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Travis Devon Ruffin (Address has been Updated) (jbs) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Inquiry (Copy of Docket Sheet Mailed) by Travis Devon Ruffin (cds) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Travis Devon Ruffin; Recommending that the Clerk of Court TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, as it is the appropriate venue. See 28 U.S.C. 2241(d). Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marton Gyires on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections. Attorney Marton Gyires added to party Secretary, Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Gyires, Marton) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jao) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00 (Not Paid/No IFP Filed), filed by Travis Devon Ruffin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jao) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RUFFIN v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRAVIS DEVON RUFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?