HART v. INCH et al
Plaintiff: RANDY A HART
Defendant: C MAIORANA, FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, T MOORE and MARK INCH
Case Number: 3:2020cv05733
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Set Deadlines re 8 Order. Amended Complaint due by 12/21/2020. Filing Fee/IFP motion due by 12/21/2020. (sdw)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff has shown good cause for the extension; therefore, the deadline for him to file an amended complaint and either pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is extended to DECEMBER 21, 2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/09/2020. (jmw)
October 9, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION for an Extension of Time. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (sdw)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for an Extension of Time by RANDY A HART. (sdw)
September 23, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (amended complaint/filing fee/IFP motion not received) (sdw)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by RANDY A HART to: Gulf Correctional Institution, 500 Ike Steele Rd, Wewahitchka FL 32346. (sdw)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 09/10/2020. (sdw)
September 9, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (sdw)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RANDY A HART. (sdw)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite prisoner consent form and financial certificate. (Amended Complaint due by 9/21/2020. IFP Motion or Fee due by 9/21/2020.) (Forms mailed w/ORDER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 8/21/2020. (mb)
August 20, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fee not paid). (mb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, RANDY A HART. (mb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, MARK INCH, C MAIORANA, T MOORE, filed by RANDY A HART. (No service copies/no IFP Motion/fee not paid). (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HART v. INCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C MAIORANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY A HART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?