YORK v. SYNCHRONY BANK et al
Plaintiff: Janet York
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, TRANS UNION LLC and SYNCHRONY BANK
Case Number: 3:2020cv05735
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC. (HOGAN, MICHELLE)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #23 Notice of Settlement as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC. That Plaintiff and Equifax shall file a status report 30 days from the date of this Order (and every 30 days thereafter) if a notice or stipulation of dismissal as to Equifax is not filed by then. (Status Report due by 11/13/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/13/2020. (mb)
October 13, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #23 Notice of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services LLC Only (mb)
October 12, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services LLC Only by JANET YORK (KERNEY, FRANK)
October 12, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SYNCHRONY BANK. (HORA, RAYMOND)
October 12, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SYNCHRONY BANK. (HORA, RAYMOND)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. That the Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC'S Unopposed #19 motion is GRANTED, and Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. shall have until October 14, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Answer due by 10/14/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/14/2020. (mb)
September 14, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (mb)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (HOGAN, MICHELLE)
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Other Affiliate NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.. (HOGAN, MICHELLE)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE HOGAN on behalf of EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC (HOGAN, MICHELLE)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/25/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2020. Discovery due by 1/11/2021. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/11/2020. (mb)
September 11, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #14 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (mb)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TRANS UNION LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TRANS UNION LLC.. (EPPS, ALEXANDRIA)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by TRANS UNION LLC. (EPPS, ALEXANDRIA)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. That Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC's Unopposed #12 MOTION For Extension of Time is GRANTED, and Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC shall have until October 12, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Answer due by 10/12/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/10/2020. (mb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (STEVENS, ROBERT)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC (STEVENS, ROBERT)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.. (STEVENS, ROBERT)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME. That the Defendant Synchrony Bank's #8 MOTION for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant Synchrony Bank shall have until October 11, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (Answer due by 10/11/2020.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/9/2020. (mb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by SYNCHRONY BANK. (HORA, RAYMOND)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by RAYMOND HORA on behalf of SYNCHRONY BANK (HORA, RAYMOND)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET YORK. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (KERNEY, FRANK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET YORK. SYNCHRONY BANK served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (KERNEY, FRANK)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET YORK. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (KERNEY, FRANK)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JANET YORK. TRANS UNION LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (KERNEY, FRANK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SYNCHRONY BANK, (Attachments: #1 EXPERIAN, #2 EQUIFAX, #3 TRANS UNION). (mb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC, SYNCHRONY BANK, TRANS UNION LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5599893.), filed by Janet York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Synchrony Bank, #3 Summons as to Equifax, #4 Summons as to Experian, #5 Summons as to Trans Union LLC) (KERNEY, FRANK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YORK v. SYNCHRONY BANK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet York
Represented By: FRANK H KERNEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC
Represented By: MICHELLE HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Represented By: ROBERT C STEVENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION LLC
Represented By: ALEXANDRIA N EPPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYNCHRONY BANK
Represented By: RAYMOND HORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?