SCEBBI v. OFFICE DEPOT INC
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DAVID SCEBBI
Defendant: OFFICE DEPOT INC
Case Number: 3:2020cv05930
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be recommended for dismissal for failure to prosecute or follow orders of the Court. The Court will discharge this show cause order if Plaintiff complies with the Court's December 14 order within the fourteen (14) days provided. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/31/2020. (Show Cause Response due by 1/14/2021). (mb)
December 28, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order - Summons(es) were not provided to clerk as ordered. (jcw)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. Within seven (7) days (12/21/2020) of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall present the requisite summons(es) for each Defendant to the clerk for signature and seal. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and within the time prescribed. If a notice of appearance by an attorney is filed on behalf of a defendant, Plaintiff shall be required to mail to the attorney a copy of every pleading or other paper submitted for consideration by the Court. Any paper submitted for filing that does not contain a certificate of service shall be returned by the clerk and disregarded by the Court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/14/2020. (jcw)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
November 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jcw)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OFFICE DEPOT INC, filed by MICHAEL DAVID SCEBBI. (Filing fee $400., FLN3-14170. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCEBBI v. OFFICE DEPOT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE DEPOT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DAVID SCEBBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?