BAJZIK v. SAUL
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE J BAJZIK
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 3:2020cv05953
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEPHANIE J BAJZIK. ANDREW SAUL served on 11/30/2020, answer due 1/29/2021. (FINELLI, DANIEL)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #3 -2 NOTICE OF FILING RETURNS OF SERVICE as to US Attorney was filed using the wrong docket event. Please refile the executed summons using the event "Summons Returned Executed as to USA," found under "Service of Process." The system will prompt you for the defendant served, and the date of service, and will automatically set a 60 day answer deadline. (alb)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING RETURNS OF SERVICE by STEPHANIE J BAJZIK re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 RETURN RECEIPT OF SERVICE ON COMMISSIONER SAUL, #2 RETURN RECEIPT OF SERVICE ON US ATTORNEY ND OF FL, #3 RETURN RECEIPT OF SERVICE ON ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE US) (FINELLI, DANIEL)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons Atty General, #2 Summons Andrew Saul) (alb)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-5792865.), filed by STEPHANIE J BAJZIK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS TO US ATTORNEY FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA, #3 SUMMONS TO ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE US, #4 SUMMONS TO OFFICE OF THE GENERAL COUNSEL OF THE SSA, #5 SUMMONS TO COMMISSIONER ANDREW SAUL) (FINELLI, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAJZIK v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE J BAJZIK
Represented By: DANIEL JASON FINELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?