EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY v. AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY
Defendant: AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY, Induron Coatings, LLC, Vulcan Pipe & Steel Coatings, LLC, VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS LLC, INDURON COATINGS LLC, UNITED STATES PIPE & FOUNDRY CO LLC and Dominic Mark Caparello
Case Number: 3:2020cv05986
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
2 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 9/1/2022). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Terms and Conditions) (VARGO, STUART)
July 19, 2022 Filing 57 NOTICE of Settlement by VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS LLC (COZART, STEPHEN)
July 19, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #57 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF CLAIMS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT, VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS, INC. (jfj)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/23/2022. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:20cv5986-MCR-ZCB.
February 2, 2022 Filing 55 STATUS REPORT Mediation Report by Dominic Mark Caparello. (CAPARELLO, DOMINIC)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REFERRAL AND ORDER re #53 JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. The motion is GRANTED. The discovery deadline, and all correlating deadlines, is extended by 90 days. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 01/12/22. (Discovery due by 10/11/2022, Dispositive Motions to be filed by 10/31/2022, Mediation to take place by 11/7/2022, Mediation Report due by 11/21/2022) (jfj)
January 10, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #53 JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. (jfj)
January 7, 2022 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Extend Time by INDURON COATINGS LLC. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re #50 JOINT MOTION For Amendment Of Scheduling ORDER. The motion is GRANTED as requested and for good cause shown. All remaining deadlines of the Final Scheduling Order, ECF No. #20 , are hereby extended by 90 days. Discovery due by 7/11/2022. The deadline for filing Dispositive Motions, as well as daubert motions, to be filed by 8/1/2022. Mediation to take place by 8/9/2022. Mediation Report due by 8/23/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/12/2021. (mb)
October 6, 2021 Filing 51 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #50 Stipulation. You are reminded, for future reference, that any document requesting judicial action, should be titled and posted as a "MOTION". (mb)
October 6, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #50 JOINT MOTION For Amendment of Final Scheduling Order and Mediation Referral. (mb)
October 5, 2021 Filing 50 JOINT MOTION For Amendment of Final Scheduling Order and Mediation Referral, by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (PUGH, PHILLIP) Modified on 10/6/2021 to correct docket text to match pdf attached. (mb).
July 9, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #48 to Motion re #42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Memorandum in Opposition, #49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (blr)
July 8, 2021 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by INDURON COATINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MASSEY, MATTHEW)
June 29, 2021 Set Deadlines re #48 Response, Reply due by 7/8/2021. (blr)
June 29, 2021 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Memorandum in Opposition filed by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (PUGH, PHILLIP) Modified to match title of document on 6/30/2021 (blr).
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/24/2021. (alb)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. The Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order, ECF No. #45 , is GRANTED, and the Agreed Confidentiality and Protective Order is APPROVED as clarified herein and will be separately entered. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/24/2021. (alb)
June 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (blr)
June 21, 2021 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY, INDURON COATINGS LLC, UNITED STATES PIPE & FOUNDRY CO LLC, VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BURKE, MARTIN)
June 14, 2021 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint by VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS LLC. (COZART, STEPHEN)
June 11, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by STUART FORBES VARGO on behalf of AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY (VARGO, STUART)
June 8, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by INDURON COATINGS LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 6/29/2021). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (MASSEY, MATTHEW)
June 8, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #39 Order. (Response to amended complaint not filed by Vulcan Pipe & Steel Coatings LLC.) (blr)
June 4, 2021 Filing 41 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (BURKE, MARTIN)
May 21, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to #38 Amended Complaint,, by INDURON COATINGS LLC. (MASSEY, MATTHEW)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #37 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, ECF No. #38 , is now the operative pleading. Responses are due within 14 days hereof. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if responses not filed earlier: 6/4/2021).) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/21/2021. (blr)
May 20, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #37 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #38 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT PROPOSED against All Defendants (blr)
May 19, 2021 Filing 38 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY; VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS, INC.; and INDURON COATINGS, LLC, filed by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 Composite of Invoices for BAFM DIP, #2 Exhibit Part 2 Composite of Invoices for BAFM DIP, #3 Exhibit Composite of Invoices for Govt St DIP, #4 Exhibit Composite of USCO Invoices for Govt St. DIP) (PUGH, PHILLIP) Modified on 5/21/2021 to correct defendants and remove "proposed". (blr).
May 19, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (PUGH, PHILLIP)
May 14, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change of Address by MARTIN E BURKE (BURKE, MARTIN)
April 8, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES PIPE & FOUNDRY CO LLC. (SAMSING, ERIK)
March 19, 2021 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by UNITED STATES PIPE & FOUNDRY CO LLC identifying Other Affiliate Forterra, Inc. for UNITED STATES PIPE & FOUNDRY CO LLC.. (SAMSING, ERIK)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. Re: #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #25 Amended Complaint . On consideration, the motion is GRANTED, as requested. UNITED STATES PIPE & FOUNDRY CO LLC answer due 4/8/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/10/2021. (blr)
March 10, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint (blr)
March 9, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #25 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES PIPE & FOUNDRY CO LLC. (SAMSING, ERIK)
March 9, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK TYLER SAMSING on behalf of UNITED STATES PIPE & FOUNDRY CO LLC (SAMSING, ERIK)
February 26, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (BURKE, MARTIN)
February 25, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint by VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS LLC. (COZART, STEPHEN)
February 24, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #25 Amended Complaint by INDURON COATINGS LLC. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
February 16, 2021 Filing 27 Summons Issued as to United States Pipe & Foundry Co. LLC. (blr)
February 12, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Request for Summons by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
February 12, 2021 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (BEASLEY, ROBERT)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re: #23 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. On consideration, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint must be filed as a separate document. Once filed, it will become the operative complaint. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/12/2021. (blr)
February 11, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (blr)
February 10, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (PUGH, PHILLIP)
February 2, 2021 Filing 22 RULE 26 Disclosures by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (BURKE, MARTIN)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. RE: #15 Motion to Strike Defendant Vulcan Pipe & Steel Coatings, Inc's Affirmative Defenses. The Court accepts the parties' scheduling proposals in the Joint Report, and the Motion to Strike is therefore MOOT. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/21/2021. (alb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 20 FINAL SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. ( Discovery due by 4/11/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/2/2022. Mediation to take place by 5/11/2022. Mediation Report due by 5/25/2022.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/21/2021. (alb) (Main Document 20 replaced on 1/22/2021) (alb).
January 20, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 Response to Motion, #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, #15 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (alb)
January 19, 2021 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
January 19, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS LLC. (COZART, STEPHEN)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT INDURON COATINGS, LLCS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [14 days] (Motion due by 1/20/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/6/2021. (mb)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [14 days]. (Motion due by 1/20/2021.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/6/2021. (mb)
January 6, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to Extend Timeto File Motion to Strike Defendant American Cast Iron Pipe Company's Affirmative Defenses, #14 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Motion to Strike Defendant Induron Coatings, LLC's Affirmative Defenses (mb)
January 4, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/19/2021). (PUGH, PHILLIP)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Motion to Strike Defendant Induron Coatings, LLC's Affirmative Defenses by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (PUGH, PHILLIP)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to Extend Timeto File Motion to Strike Defendant American Cast Iron Pipe Company's Affirmative Defenses by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (PUGH, PHILLIP)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY. (PUGH, PHILLIP)
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS LLC. (COZART, STEPHEN)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (BURKE, MARTIN)
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by INDURON COATINGS LLC. (MASSEY, MATTHEW)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 American Cast Iron Pipe Company's ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (BURKE, MARTIN)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/28/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/25/2021. Discovery due by 6/11/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/11/2020. (mb)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Vulcan Pipe & Steel Coatings, LLC. (COZART, STEPHEN)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS on behalf of Induron Coatings, LLC (WIGGINS, CHARLES)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN MARSHALL COZART on behalf of Vulcan Pipe & Steel Coatings, LLC (COZART, STEPHEN)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Induron Coatings, LLC. (MASSEY, MATTHEW)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW PAUL MASSEY on behalf of Induron Coatings, LLC (MASSEY, MATTHEW)
December 11, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (mb)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY from Circuit Court in and For Escambia County, Florida, case number 2020 CA 001431. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5827194.), filed by AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (BURKE, MARTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY v. AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN CAST IRON PIPE COMPANY
Represented By: MARTIN E BURKE
Represented By: STUART FORBES VARGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Induron Coatings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vulcan Pipe & Steel Coatings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VULCAN PIPE & STEEL COATINGS LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN MARSHALL COZART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDURON COATINGS LLC
Represented By: MATTHEW PAUL MASSEY
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES PIPE & FOUNDRY CO LLC
Represented By: ERIK TYLER SAMSING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Mark Caparello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY
Represented By: DEWITT D CLARK
Represented By: PHILLIP ASHLEY PUGH
Represented By: ROBERT OTHELL BEASLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?