DAVIS v. STATE OF FLORIDA et al
Plaintiff: FRANK S DAVIS
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA, PAMELA J BONDI, JULIE L JONES, DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL FIRST DISTRICT STATE OF FLORIDA and FIRST DISTRICT COURT STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 3:2020cv06011
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must show cause, if any, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the courts order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/11/2021. Show Cause Response due by 3/15/2021. (alb)
February 4, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #4 Order. (No filings.) (alb)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form for use by non-prisoners proceeding pro se and the correct set of forms for filing an IFP motion. This case number should be written on the forms. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the proper form or pay the $402.00 filing fee. Also within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint. (Order and forms mailed.) ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/5/2021. (alb)
December 22, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by FRANK S DAVIS. (alb)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PAMELA J BONDI, DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL FIRST DISTRICT STATE OF FLORIDA, FIRST DISTRICT COURT STATE OF FLORIDA, JULIE L JONES, STATE OF FLORIDA, filed by FRANK S DAVIS. (No service copies.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. STATE OF FLORIDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMELA J BONDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE L JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL FIRST DISTRICT STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST DISTRICT COURT STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK S DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?