ROBINSON v. LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Plaintiff: GARRY ROBINSON
Defendant: LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Case Number: 3:2021cv00186
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON identifying Corporate Parent LINCOLN NATIONAL CORPORATION, Other Affiliate THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY for LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON.. (MARCUS, LEE)
March 25, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Scheduling Order. (Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed) (blr)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/22/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/19/2021. Discovery due by 9/5/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/5/2021. (blr) Modified to correct filing date on 3/11/2021 (blr).
March 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 Answer to Complaint. (Please see Proposed ISO.) (blr)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (MARCUS, LEE)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON. (blr)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE SUMMONS by GARRY ROBINSON re #1 Complaint (HALL, CHARLES)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5921439.), filed by GARRY ROBINSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (HALL, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBINSON v. LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRY ROBINSON
Represented By: CHARLES PHILIP HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINCOLN LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON
Represented By: LEE WARREN MARCUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?