VICK v. BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: Julie Deeann Vick
Defendant: BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2021cv00209
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 RULE 26 Disclosures by BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION. (VAN SICKLE, RUSSELL)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER. (Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/11/2022. Discovery due by 4/20/2022. Mediation to be completed by 5/4/2022. Mediation Report due by 5/11/2022.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 4/7/2021. (blr)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (HARNE, ALEXANDER)
April 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (blr)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION. (VAN SICKLE, RUSSELL)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/19/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/19/2021. Discovery due by 7/1/2021. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/5/2021. (blr)
March 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. (Please see Proposed ISO.) (blr)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION. (VAN SICKLE, RUSSELL)
February 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JULIE DEEANN VICK. BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (HARNE, ALEXANDER)
February 15, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by JULIE DEEANN VICK. (HARNE, ALEXANDER)
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER THOMAS HARNE on behalf of JULIE DEEANN VICK (HARNE, ALEXANDER)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION. (blr)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5931771.), filed by Julie Deeann Vick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (STORCH, NOAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VICK v. BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Deeann Vick
Represented By: NOAH E STORCH
Represented By: ALEXANDER THOMAS HARNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAPTIST HEALTH CARE CORPORATION
Represented By: RUSSELL FRANK VAN SICKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?