IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES
Plaintiff: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES
Defendant: UNKNOWN
Counter Claimant: MARINA MANAGEMENT CORP
Case Number: 3:2021cv00403
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
2 Judge: ROGER VINSON
3 Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Claims. The motion is GRANTED, and the deadline for filing claims in this case is extended to June 11, 2021. This extension does not affect the deadline for filing claims in any of the other consolidated cases, nor does it affect the briefing schedule established in Doc. 27 in Case No. 3:20cv5943. (Deadline for all persons asserting claims due by 6/11/2021.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 4/29/2021. (blr)
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Claims by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES. (SHINKLE, THEODORE)
April 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION to Extend Time for Filing Claims (blr)
April 5, 2021 Filing 10 Petitioners' ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Marina Management Corp. by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES. (SHINKLE, THEODORE)
April 2, 2021 Set Deadline: Answer to Counterclaim #9 due by 4/22/2021. (blr)
April 1, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES by MARINA MANAGEMENT CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (FLEMING, EDWARD)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Case Nos. 3:21cv333, 3:21cv369, and 3:21cv403 are consolidated as part of Case No. 3:20cv5943. The Clerk shall reassign the newly consolidated cases to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Frank in conformance with the other cases. The newly consolidated cases are subject to the deadlines established in the scheduling order in case 3:20cv5943 (Doc. 27). Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON no longer assigned to case, Cases associated. Set/Clear Flags. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/10/2021. (blr)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MONITION re #6 Order. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/10/2021. (blr)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF MONITION AND INJUNCTION re #3 MOTION. (Deadline for all persons asserting claims due by 4/23/2021.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/10/2021. (blr)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II for all further proceedings. SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON no longer assigned to case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 3/10/2021. (blr)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Filing by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SHINKLE, THEODORE)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Approve Ad Interim Stipulation and to Enter Monition and Injunction by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (SHINKLE, THEODORE)
March 10, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION to Approve Ad Interim Stipulation and to Enter Monition and Injunction. (blr)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 STIPULATION (Ad Interim) of Value and Stipulation for Costs by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES. (SHINKLE, THEODORE)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5978132.), filed by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SHINKLE, THEODORE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF STEPHEN AND CAROL BERKES
Represented By: THEODORE LIVINGSTON SHINKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MARINA MANAGEMENT CORP
Represented By: EDWARD P FLEMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?