LIBERTO v. THE GAP INC
Plaintiff: Pamela Liberto
Defendant: The Gap, Inc. and THE GAP INC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00510
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 17 Case Transferred Out to Another District. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 3:21cv00436, filed 04/22/2021. (jcw)
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 Interdistrict Transfer to the Middle District of Florida. (jcw)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #15 Motion to Transfer Case. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to STAY this case and all deadlines pending further order, TRANSFER the case to the Middle District of Florida, and close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/21/2021. (jcw)
April 20, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA. (jcw)
April 19, 2021 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA by THE GAP INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/3/2021). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeffrey Held, #2 Exhibit B - Declarations of Lisa Mertens filed in Banana Republic and Old Navy cases) (TREHAN, ASHLEY)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Michael G. Rhodes, of the law firm of Cooley LLP, is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Defendant, The Gap, Inc., pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/16/2021. (jcw)
April 16, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION REQUESTING JUDICIAL NOTICE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW. (jcw)
April 16, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/29/2021). (jcw)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION REQUESTING JUDICIAL NOTICE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by THE GAP INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Privacy Policy Eff. 1/1/20-6/30/20, #2 Exhibit B - Privacy Policy Eff. 7/1/20-9/21/20, #3 Exhibit C - Privacy Policy Eff. 9/22/20-Present) (TREHAN, ASHLEY) Modified on 4/16/2021 to amend title (jcw).
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by THE GAP INC. (TREHAN, ASHLEY) Modified on 4/16/2021 to amend title (jcw).
April 15, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael G. Rhodes.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6038813.) (jcw)
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael G. Rhodes.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6038813.) by THE GAP INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (RHODES, MICHAEL)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS by THE GAP INC. Amendment to #3 Notice (Other) of Related Actions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended List of Related Actions) (MAGLICH, JORDAN) Modified on 4/14/2021 to amend title (jcw).
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER CHAGAS GOLD on behalf of PAMELA LIBERTO (GOLD, CHRISTOPHER)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by THE GAP INC. (MAGLICH, JORDAN)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REFERRAL AND ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. (Answer due by 4/15/2021). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/24/2021. (jcw)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/7/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/7/2021. Discovery due by 9/24/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/24/2021. (jcw)
March 24, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #1 Notice of Removal (See proposed ISO). (jcw)
March 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN DAVID MAGLICH on behalf of The Gap, Inc. (MAGLICH, JORDAN)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The Gap, Inc.. (TREHAN, ASHLEY)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS by The Gap, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Related Actions) (TREHAN, ASHLEY)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet) (TREHAN, ASHLEY)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Gap, Inc. from First Judicial Circuit, Escambia County, Florida, case number 2021 CA 000349. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6000882.), filed by The Gap, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Remaining State Court File, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Jeffrey Held) (TREHAN, ASHLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIBERTO v. THE GAP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Liberto
Represented By: ANDREW JOHN SHAMIS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CHAGAS GOLD
Represented By: Scott Adam Edelsberg
Represented By: MANUEL SANTIAGO HIRALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gap, Inc.
Represented By: ASHLEY ELIZABETH TREHAN
Represented By: JORDAN DAVID MAGLICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GAP INC
Represented By: ASHLEY ELIZABETH TREHAN
Represented By: JORDAN DAVID MAGLICH
Represented By: MICHAEL GRAHAM RHODES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?