IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF SUNSET MARINE VENTURES, LLC and FRANCIS HERRBOLD
Plaintiff: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF SUNSET MARINE VENTURES, LLC and FRANCIS HERRBOLD
Counter Claimant: MARINA MANAGEMENT CORP.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00516
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Marina Management Corp. by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF SUNSET MARINE VENTURES, LLC and FRANCIS HERRBOLD. (SHINKLE, THEODORE)
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against SUNSET MARINE VENTURES, LLC and FRANCIS HERRBOLD. (FLEMING, EDWARD) Modified to correct counterclaim party on 4/20/2021 (blr).
April 1, 2021 Set Deadlines re: #6 Monition. (Deadline for all persons asserting claims due by 5/7/2021.) (blr)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MONITION re #5 Order. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/26/2021. (blr)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF MONITION AND INJUNCTION re #4 MOTION to Approve. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/26/2021. (blr)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Approve Ad Interim Stipulation and to Enter Monition and Injunction by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF SUNSET MARINE VENTURES, LLC and FRANCIS HERRBOLD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (SHINKLE, THEODORE)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk shall assign to the undersigned and Magistrate Judge Michael J. Frank and consolidate with these cases any and all future admiralty cases filed in this District by Mr. Shinkle in which the petitioner seeks exoneration from, or limitation of, liability relating to Hurricane Sally and in which Marina Management Corp. appears, or is expected to appear, as a claimant. The deadlines in the Scheduling Order in case 3:20cv5943 (Doc. 27) shall apply to all subsequently filed and consolidated cases. Case reassigned to JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II and MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS, MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. Cases associated. Set/Clear Flags. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/11/2021. (blr)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 STIPULATION (Ad Interim) of Value and Stipulation for Costs by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF SUNSET MARINE VENTURES, LLC and FRANCIS HERRBOLD. (SHINKLE, THEODORE)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against UNKNOWN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6004087.), filed by IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF SUNSET MARINE VENTURES, LLC and FRANCIS HERRBOLD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SHINKLE, THEODORE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF SUNSET MARINE VENTURES, LLC and FRANCIS HERRBOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IN THE MATTER OF THE COMPLAINT OF SUNSET MARINE VENTURES, LLC and FRANCIS HERRBOLD
Represented By: THEODORE LIVINGSTON SHINKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: MARINA MANAGEMENT CORP.
Represented By: EDWARD P FLEMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?