LIBERTO v. DILLARDS INC
Plaintiff: PAMELA LIBERTO
Defendant: DILLARD'S INC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00517
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting as requested DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/10/2021. DILLARD'S INC answer due 6/7/2021. (alb)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. This matter is before the Court on Defendant Dillard's, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #12 , and Defendant's Unopposed Motion Requesting Judicial Notice, ECF No. #13 . The foregoing motions are mooted by Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. See, ECF No. #16 . The Clerk is directed to document the motions, ECF No. 12 & 13, as MOOT. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/10/2021. (alb)
May 10, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, re #16 Amended Complaint. (alb) Modified on 5/10/2021 to reflect the correct judge(alb).
May 7, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #16 Amended Complaint by DILLARD'S INC. (MAGLICH, JORDAN)
May 1, 2021 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against DILLARD'S INC, filed by PAMELA LIBERTO. (HIRALDO, MANUEL)
April 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (HIRALDO, MANUEL)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The Unopposed Motion for Jessie Simpson LaGoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #11 , is GRANTED. Attorney Jessie Simpson LaGoy of the firm Cooley LLP, is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Defendant pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/23/2021. (blr)
April 22, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #12 Motion to Dismiss. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/6/2021). (alb)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 Moot per #18 Order. Consent MOTION Requesting Judicial Notice and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by DILLARD'S INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Privacy Policy Eff. 12/30/19 - 6/30/20, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Privacy Policy Eff 7/1/20 - Present) (MAGLICH, JORDAN) Modified on 5/10/2021 (alb).
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 Moot per #18 Order. MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by DILLARD'S INC. Re #1 -1 Complaint. (MAGLICH, JORDAN) Modified on 4/23/2021 (alb). Modified on 5/10/2021 (alb).
April 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessie Simpson LaGoy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6055431.) (alb)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessie Simpson LaGoy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6055431.) by DILLARD'S INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (LAGOY, JESSIE)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by DILLARD'S INC. Amendment to #3 Notice (Other) of Related Actions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended List of Related Actions) (MAGLICH, JORDAN)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER CHAGAS GOLD on behalf of PAMELA LIBERTO (GOLD, CHRISTOPHER)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by DILLARD'S INC. (MAGLICH, JORDAN)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/9/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/10/2021. Discovery due by 9/26/2021. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/26/2021. (alb)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Class Action Complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/22/2021). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/26/2021. (alb)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MANUEL SANTIAGO HIRALDO on behalf of PAMELA LIBERTO (HIRALDO, MANUEL)
March 26, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, and Class Action Complaint. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb)
March 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, and Class Action Complaint by DILLARD'S INC. (MAGLICH, JORDAN)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Actions by DILLARD'S INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - List of Related Cases) (MAGLICH, JORDAN)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MAGLICH, JORDAN)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DILLARD'S INC of Class Action Complaint from First Judicial Circuit, Escambia County, case number 2021-CA-000350. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6004413.), filed by DILLARD'S INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - State Court Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Return of Summons, #3 Exhibit Ex C - State Court File, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Declaration of Maiga Bishop) (MAGLICH, JORDAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIBERTO v. DILLARDS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA LIBERTO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER CHAGAS GOLD
Represented By: ANDREW JOHN SHAMIS
Represented By: MANUEL SANTIAGO HIRALDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DILLARD'S INC
Represented By: JORDAN DAVID MAGLICH
Represented By: ASHLEY ELIZABETH TREHAN
Represented By: JESSIE LAGOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?