BASKIN v. DESANTIS et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD L BASKIN
Defendant: REGIONAL DIRECTOR, AARON LEAVINS, MARK S INCH, UNKNOWN ASSISTANT SECRETARY OF INSTITUTION, W CLEMMONS, RON DESANTIS, JACKSON and P E WHITE
Case Number: 3:2021cv00823
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Response to Order to Show Cause. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in the Northern District. This case number should be written on the forms. On or before 8/26/2021, Plaintiff must (1) file an amended complaint, which must be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court form, and titled "Amended Complaint"; and (2) either pay the $402.00 filing fee file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite prisoner consent form and financial certificate, including an attached computer printout of the transactions in his inmate account during the preceding six-month period. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 7/26/2021. (jcw)(Forms sent as ordered.)
July 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #7 Response to Order to Show Cause. (jcw)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by EDWARD L BASKIN. (jcw)
July 11, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #2 Order. (Amended complaint not received.) (blr)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Plaintiff's Notice of Change of Address indicating that his current address is Lake Correctional Institution, which contains multiple case numbers in the style of the document, was received by the clerk of court on June 22, 2021. As Plaintiff was previously advised, he may not submit one document with multiple case numbers for filing in each case referenced in the style of the document. If Plaintiff wishes to file the same document in multiple cases, he must submit a separate document for each case with only that case's number referenced in the style of the document. For this reason, it is ORDERED: The clerk of court is directed to RETURN the document to Plaintiff without filing. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 7/6/2021. (blr)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiff's Reply to Show Cause of Action of Consolidated Racketeering Cases was received by the clerk of court on June 22, 2021, and contains multiple case numbers in the style of the document. The clerk of court is directed to RETURN the document to Plaintiff without filing. Plaintiff is advised that if he again disregards the court's directive by submitting a document with multiple case numbers, the court will dismiss each of those cases without further notice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 7/1/2021. (blr)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate Plaintiff's "Motion to Access to Courts Without Sale, Denial or Delay (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED. However, the deadline for Plaintiff to either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a fully completed IFP motion with the requisite attachments is extended to JULY 26, 2021. (Order and form mailed.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 06/24/2021. (alb)
June 24, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #4 Order, IFP or Fee due by 7/26/2021. (alb)
June 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION TO ACCESS TO COURTS WITHOUT SALE, DENIAL OR DELAY. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (jcw)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION TO ACCESS TO COURTS WITHOUT SALE, DENIAL OR DELAY by EDWARD L BASKIN. (jcw)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in the Northern District. This case number should be written on the forms. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Amended Complaint due by 7/5/2021. IFP/Fee due by 7/5/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 6/4/2021. (Forms mailed w/Order.) (blr)
June 3, 2021 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
June 3, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W CLEMMONS, RON DESANTIS, MARK S INCH, JACKSON, AARON LEAVINS, REGIONAL DIRECTOR, UNKNOWN ASSISTANT SECRETARY OF INSTITUTION, P E WHITE, filed by EDWARD L BASKIN. (No service copies, IFP motion or fee.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASKIN v. DESANTIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONAL DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON LEAVINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK S INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN ASSISTANT SECRETARY OF INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W CLEMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON DESANTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P E WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD L BASKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?