TOOKS v. WARDEN
Petitioner: AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR.
Respondent: WARDEN
Case Number: 3:2021cv00925
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 20 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:19-cv-16330. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 27, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #19 Case Transferred In - District Transfer.. (jcw)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Petitioner's #14 Motion to Transfer Case to Northern District of Florida; Directing Clerk to close this case, etc ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/26/2021. (rss, n.m.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
July 16, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion filed by WARDEN re #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Florida (PASCAL, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing the Clerk to update the Petitioner's mailing address on the docket; ORDERED that the United States shall file a response to Petitioner's motion within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/2/2021. (rtm, )(nm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 NEF Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR (alb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Florida by AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
June 17, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Florida. Motion set for 7/19/2021 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 Letter re case status from AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR.. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response re #10 Response to Habeas Petition, from AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR.. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Letter addressed to Judge Hillman from AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR. re U.S. Assistant Attorney, Elizabeth A. Pascal #8 letter (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WARDEN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Pascal, #2 Exhibit to Pascal Decl., #3 Declaration of Corrie Dobovich, #4 Exhibit to Dobovich Decl., #5 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Respondent's #8 request for an extension of time; Directing Respondent to file the answer within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/11/2019. (rss, n.m.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Elizabeth Pascal re: Extension of Time to Answer the Petition re #4 Order to Answer. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL on behalf of WARDEN (PASCAL, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Letter re: reopening verification from AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR.. (rss, docket sheet sent) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Letter request to reopen case from AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR.. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER; Respondent may file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition on jurisdiction grounds only within forty-five (45) days of the date this Order, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/22/2019. (rss, n.m.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
August 19, 2019 REOPENING CASE: The Clerk is in receipt of the re Filing Fee Received filed on 08/12/2019 and hereby reopens the case for review by a Judicial Officer. (dpw) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
August 12, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number CAM10638 (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall supply petitioner with a blank IFP Application. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/7/2019. (cry, notice and IFP sent) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/7/2019. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
August 7, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Memorandum in Support of Petition, #3 Envelope)NO FF/IFP(ssp, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 7/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOOKS v. WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AL CORNELIUS TOOKS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?