APPEX PROPERTIES LLC v. WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: APPEX PROPERTIES, LLC. D/B/A IVORY INVESTMENTS LLC and APPEX PROPERTIES LLC doing business as IVORY INVESTMENTS LLC
Defendant: WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2021cv01020
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRALRe: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting: ( Discovery due by 8/1/2022., Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 9/9/2022., Mediation Report due by 7/14/2022.), Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/3/2021. (jcw)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent AIG for WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY.. (SEIBERT, TROY)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by APPEX PROPERTIES LLC. (REYES, ROBIN)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SEIBERT, TROY)
October 21, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (jcw)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/1/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2021. Discovery due by 4/18/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/18/2021. (jcw)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBIN LUIS REYES on behalf of All Plaintiffs (REYES, ROBIN)
October 15, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (See proposed ISO) (jcw)
October 14, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #2 Notice of Attorney Admission, #3 Notice of Attorney Admission - 30 days has elapsed without an appearance of counsel for Plaintiff. (jcw)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to LEVI GLICK, ESQ. on behalf of APPEX PROPERTIES LLC. (jcw)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to ENRIQUE PINEIRO, ESQ. on behalf of APPEX PROPERTIES LLC. (jcw)
September 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadline - Clerk to check status of #2 , #3 Attorney Admission on 10/13/2021. (jcw)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY from 1st Judicial Circuit, case number 2021 CA 000902. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6304421.), filed by WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (SEIBERT, TROY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APPEX PROPERTIES LLC v. WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APPEX PROPERTIES, LLC. D/B/A IVORY INVESTMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APPEX PROPERTIES LLC doing business as IVORY INVESTMENTS LLC
Represented By: ROBIN LUIS REYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: TROY JONATHAN SEIBERT
Represented By: AARON FORTIER
Represented By: VINCENT A FERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?