LADNER v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: GARY W LADNER
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA and LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA doing business as CIGNA
Case Number: 3:2021cv01611
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb)
December 17, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)
December 8, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Second Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint (until December 9, 2021). Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to December 9, 2021. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/9/2021).) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/30/2021. (mb)
November 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (mb)
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint [until November 29, 2021]. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to November 29, 2021. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/29/2021).) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/29/2021. (mb)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/6/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/5/2022. Discovery due by 5/18/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/22/2021. (mb)
November 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint , #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons (please see proposed ISO). (mb)
November 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint (mb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent The New York Life Insurance Company for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARY W LADNER. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (alb)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Summons for Issuance by Clerk by GARY W LADNER (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6502735.), filed by GARY W LADNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (TAYLOR, STEPHANIE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LADNER v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY W LADNER
Represented By: STEPHANIE ANN TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA doing business as CIGNA
Represented By: STEVEN DOUGLAS LEHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?