STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC v. SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC and STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC doing business as SMART TARP other COWABUNGA doing business as EL PASO GUSTAVO 1
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2021cv01657
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Plaintiff's motion for remand (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the First Judicial Circuit, in and for Escambia County, Florida. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and close the case file. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/7/2021. (alb)
November 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/13/2021).) by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy Change Endorsement re Mortgagee, #2 Exhibit B - UCMS - underlying MTD, #3 Exhibit C - UCMS Case - underlying Order, #4 Exhibit D - Union Restoration case) (YOUNG, JULIA)
November 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (alb)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Julia Young) (YOUNG, JULIA)
November 16, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY for SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (YOUNG, JULIA)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (MCELLIGOTT, MATTHEW)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The motion to dismiss (Doc. #4 ) is DENIED as moot, and Defendant shall have 14 days from the date of this Order to answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint. ( Answer due by 11/29/2021.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/15/2021. (alb)
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #6 Initial Scheduling Order.Each non-governmental corporate party must file a statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. The deadline for filing the statement is set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, and, if not filed sooner, the statement must in any event be filed within 14 days of the date of the scheduling order. The deadline expired on 11/12/2021. A corporate disclosure statement must be filed no later than 11/22/2021. Clerk to notify chambers on 11/22/2021. (alb)
November 15, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #8 Amended Complaint (alb)
November 12, 2021 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment of Benefits, #2 Exhibit Insurance Policy) (MCELLIGOTT, MATTHEW)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand) (MCELLIGOTT, MATTHEW)
November 12, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/26/2021). (jcw)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/12/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/13 /2021. Discovery due by 2/25/2022. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 10/29/2021. (alb)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW MCELLIGOTT on behalf of STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC (MCELLIGOTT, MATTHEW) Modified on 10/28/2021 to correct the appearance is on behalf of plaintiff defendant (alb).
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Lack of Standing ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/12/2021).) by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - MTD underlying 2d DCA UCMS decision, #3 Exhibit C - Order underlying 2d DCA UCMS decision) (YOUNG, JULIA)
October 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice of Appearance. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb)
October 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing State Court Pleadings by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copies of Process) (YOUNG, JULIA)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE mailed to attorney Eileen Siles, Esq,Pazos Law Group, 800 Douglas Rd., Ste. 830, Coral Gables, FL. 33134. (alb)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY from FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, ESCAMBIA COUNTY, case number 2021CA002558. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6505280.), filed by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (YOUNG, JULIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC v. SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STORM DAMAGE SOLUTIONS, LLC doing business as SMART TARP other COWABUNGA doing business as EL PASO GUSTAVO 1
Represented By: MATTHEW MCELLIGOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JULIA G YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?