MUN IN SUK v. WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: Mun In Suk and IN SUK MUN
Defendant: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2021cv01983
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #8 Proposed Pretrial Order.( Discovery due by 5/31/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/21/2022. Mediation to take place by 6/28/2022. Mediation Report due by 7/12/2022.) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/3/2022. (alb)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (CHANG, DAVID) Modified on 12/28/2021 to match title of document (alb).
December 28, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Joint Scheduling Report. (alb)
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID YOW-REN CHANG on behalf of WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY (CHANG, DAVID)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/16/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/18/2022. Discovery due by 5/31/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/2/2021. (alb)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DEREK METTS on behalf of IN SUK MUN (METTS, DEREK)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by IN SUK MUN. (METTS, DEREK)
December 2, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice of Appearance. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE mailed to Derek L. Metts, Esq., Metts Legal, P.A., 32o Maitland Ave., Altamonte Springs, FL 32701. (alb)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Ltd, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY.. (FARRANT, LAURA)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY from In the Circuit Court of Escambia County, case number 2021-CA-001033. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6534704.), filed by WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Estimate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Property Appraiser Records, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Articles of Incorporation of People's Beauty Supplies, LLC, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Yuson Chong Property Appraiser Records, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Affidavit Affidavit of Laura F. Farrant, Esq.) (FARRANT, LAURA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MUN IN SUK v. WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mun In Suk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IN SUK MUN
Represented By: DEREK METTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LAURA FARACH FARRANT
Represented By: DAVID YOW-REN CHANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?