MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. VANSHI LLC
Plaintiff: MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY and SYNDICATE 1458 AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON
Defendant: VANSHI LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv02169
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel Appraisal and Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, or Alternatively Stay Proceedings (ECF No. #5 ) is extended to January 14, 2022. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/14/2022). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/3/2022. (alb)
December 30, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6603547.) (alb)
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Motion to Dismiss Complaint by MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, SYNDICATE 1458 AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON. (MAHFOOD, MARCUS)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6603547.) by MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, SYNDICATE 1458 AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (FEILER, MICHAEL)
December 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC WILLIAM DICKEY on behalf of VANSHI LLC (DICKEY, ERIC)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Motion to Dismiss Complaint by VANSHI LLC. (DICKEY, ERIC)
December 17, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Motion to Dismiss Complaint, or Alternatively Stay Proceedings. (alb)
December 17, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb)
December 17, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #5 MOTION to Compel Appraisal and Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (alb)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on VANSHI LLC on 11-27-2021, filed by MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY, SYNDICATE 1458 AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON. (MAHFOOD, MARCUS)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to VANSHI LLC. (jcw)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MAHFOOD, MARCUS)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against VANSHI LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6540289.), filed by MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Summons for Vanshi LLC) (MAHFOOD, MARCUS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY et al v. VANSHI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MT HAWLEY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MARCUS G MAHFOOD
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID FEILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYNDICATE 1458 AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON
Represented By: MARCUS G MAHFOOD
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID FEILER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANSHI LLC
Represented By: ERIC WILLIAM DICKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?