INTELLIGENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC v. STILES et al
Plaintiff: Intelligent Management Services, LLC doing business as IMS ExpertServices and INTELLIGENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC doing business as IMS ExpertServices
Defendant: Sharidan Stiles, Stiles 4 U, Inc. and STILES 4 U INC
Case Number: 3:2021cv02198
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SHARIDAN STILES, STILES 4 U INC. (mb)
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 Request for Entry of Default by INTELLIGENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC. (HENRY, BRIAN)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTELLIGENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC. SHARIDAN STILES served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (HENRY, BRIAN)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTELLIGENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC. STILES 4 U INC served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (HENRY, BRIAN)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SEALING EXHIBITS re #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. That the motion is GRANTED, and Plaintiff may file Exhibits A and B to the complaint under seal. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 11/12/2021. (mb)
November 12, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to REGISTERED AGENT FOR STILES R U INC, (Attachments: #1 Summons - SHARIDAN STILES) (mb)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (mb)
November 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A and Exhibit B to Complaint (mb)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Intelligent Management Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Expert Holdings, LLC for Intelligent Management Services, LLC.. (HENRY, BRIAN)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A and Exhibit B to Complaint by Intelligent Management Services, LLC. (HENRY, BRIAN)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE Summons to be Issued to Sharidan Stiles by Intelligent Management Services, LLC re #1 Complaint (HENRY, BRIAN)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE Summons to be Issued to Stiles 4 U, Inc. by Intelligent Management Services, LLC re #1 Complaint (HENRY, BRIAN)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6540693.), filed by Intelligent Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HENRY, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTELLIGENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC v. STILES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intelligent Management Services, LLC doing business as IMS ExpertServices
Represented By: BRIAN PATRICK HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTELLIGENT MANAGEMENT SOLUTIONS LLC doing business as IMS ExpertServices
Represented By: BRIAN PATRICK HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharidan Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stiles 4 U, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STILES 4 U INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?