ASKEGARD v. ESCAMBIA COUNTY JAIL
Plaintiff: TRENT COLE ASKEGARD
Defendant: ESCAMBIA COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 3:2021cv02918
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - That this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Court orders. That the clerk be directed to close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 1/11/2022. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/8/2022. (mb)
January 7, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #4 Order to Show Cause. (No responses or objections filed). Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or comply with Court orders. The Court will discharge the show cause order if Plaintiff complies with the Court's November 22 order within the fourteen (14) days provided. Plaintiff is reminded that failure to comply with this order, or any order of the Court, may result in a recommendation that his case be dismissed without further notice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 12/21/2021. Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2022. (mb)
December 15, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #3 Order. (No filing fee or IFP MOTION received). (mb)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a complete set of forms needed to file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis for prisoners. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $402.00 filing fee. (Filing Fee or IFP MOTION due by 12/13/2021.) (Form mailed w/ORDER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/22/2021. (mb)
November 22, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (No service copies/no IFP motion/fee not paid). (mb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, TRENT COLE ASKEGARD. (mb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ESCAMBIA COUNTY JAIL, filed by TRENT COLE ASKEGARD. (No service copies/no IFP motion/fee not paid). (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASKEGARD v. ESCAMBIA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRENT COLE ASKEGARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESCAMBIA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?