MCMILLIAN v. USRE LLC
Plaintiff: PAXTON MCMILLIAN
Defendant: U.S.R.E, LLC d/b/ AT HOME INN, KEVIN R. GALLAGHER, USRE LLC doing business as AT HOME INN and KEVIN R GALLAGHER
Case Number: 3:2021cv04029
Filed: December 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by KEVIN R GALLAGHER, USRE LLC. (UNRUH, JESSE)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/19/2022. ( Answer due by 1/25/2022.) (alb) Modified on 1/21/2022 to correct file date (alb).
January 19, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (alb)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by KEVIN R GALLAGHER, USRE LLC. (UNRUH, JESSE)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by PAXTON MCMILLIAN as to KEVIN R GALLAGHER. (CONNORS, CLAYTON)
December 30, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on USRE, LLC on 12/15/2021, filed by PAXTON MCMILLIAN. (CONNORS, CLAYTON)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to KEVIN R. GALLAGHER, U.S.R.E, LLC d/b/ AT HOME INN. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kevin Gallagher) (alb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Please note for future reference that aliases (DBA) are entered separately and are not to be included in the party name. The party name will be corrected by the clerk. (alb)
December 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6582115.), filed by PAXTON MCMILLIAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (CONNORS, CLAYTON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCMILLIAN v. USRE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAXTON MCMILLIAN
Represented By: CLAYTON MORRIS CONNORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.R.E, LLC d/b/ AT HOME INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN R. GALLAGHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USRE LLC doing business as AT HOME INN
Represented By: JESSE IAN UNRUH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN R GALLAGHER
Represented By: JESSE IAN UNRUH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?