MILLER v. SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Plaintiff: WILLIS MILLER
Defendant: SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, J SANTAIGO, OAKS and MRS BENNIFELD
Case Number: 3:2021cv04774
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute or comply with Court orders. The Court will discharge the show cause order if Plaintiff complies with the Court's January 3, 2022 Order #4 within the fourteen (14) days provided. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 02/01/22. (Show Cause Response due by 2/15/2022.) (jfj)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER.The clerk shall send to Plaintiff a 1983 Civil Rights Complaint form for prisoners. The clerk shall designate the complaint form as an "Amended Complaint." Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on this Court's official form. Also within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall pay the full $402.00 filing fee. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order as instructed may result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 01/03/22. (AMENDED COMPLAINT Due by 1/24/2022, Fee due by 1/24/2022.) (Form mailed to Plaintiff as directed.) (jfj)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT re #3 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Case is ready for transfer from Middle District of Florida. Case 3:21-cv-04774 has been randomly assigned to: presiding Judge LACEY A COLLIER from deck Pensacola-District Judge. (jfj)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-01230. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (Transferred from MDFL) (jfj)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr on 12/21/2021. (CAW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/23/2021.]
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bennifeld, Oaks, Santa Rosa Correctional Institution, J. Santaigo filed by Willis Miller. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (no IFP, no service copies, postmarked 12/13/2021) (AEP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 12/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIS MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J SANTAIGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OAKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRS BENNIFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?