ETM PROPERTIES LLC v. SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: E.T.M. Properties LLC and ETM PROPERTIES LLC
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2021cv04943
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All pending motions are denied as moot, this case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and the Clerk shall close the case file. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/14/2022. (alb)
January 13, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by ETM PROPERTIES LLC. (GREEN, DENNIS)
January 13, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #6 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (alb)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/21/2022). (KELLER, THOMAS)
January 3, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #4 Initial Scheduling Order. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/20/2022. (alb)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/18/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/16/2022. Discovery due by 4/29/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/20/2022. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/3/2022. (alb) Modified on 1/4/2022 to add Dispositive Motions Deadline (alb).
January 3, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KELLER, THOMAS)
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
January 3, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY from First Judicial Circuit, Escambia County, case number 2021-CA-002910. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6606628.), filed by SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Division of Corporations Record, #3 Exhibit Voting Registration, #4 Exhibit Escambia Property Record, #5 Exhibit Estimates) (KELLER, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ETM PROPERTIES LLC v. SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.T.M. Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETM PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: DENNIS DAVID GREEN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS A KELLER
Represented By: CASEY BURNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?