SILVER SANDS JOINT VENTURE PARTNERSHIP v. HAGGAR DIRECT INC et al
Plaintiff: SILVER SANDS JOINT VENTURE PARTNERSHIP
Defendant: HAGGAR DIRECT, INC., HAGGAR CLOTHING CO., HAGGAR DIRECT INC and HAGGAR CLOTHING CO
Case Number: 3:2022cv00059
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT re #9 Parties' Joint MOTION to Remand. That the motion is GRANTED, and this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the First Judicial Circuit in and for Walton County. The Clerk shall close the case file in this Court. (Copy of Order mailed to First Judicial Circuit Court). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 2/4/2022. (mb)
February 3, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by SILVER SANDS JOINT VENTURE PARTNERSHIP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Draft Order) (FOLLAND, ROBERT)
February 3, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court. (alb)
January 19, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SILVER SANDS JOINT VENTURE PARTNERSHIP identifying Other Affiliate Simon Property Group, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for SILVER SANDS JOINT VENTURE PARTNERSHIP.. (FOLLAND, ROBERT)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses,and, COUNTERCLAIM against SILVER SANDS JOINT VENTURE PARTNERSHIP by HAGGAR CLOTHING CO, HAGGAR DIRECT INC. (WASHBURN, JAMES)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HAGGAR CLOTHING CO, HAGGAR DIRECT INC identifying Corporate Parent HAGGAR CORP. for HAGGAR CLOTHING CO, HAGGAR DIRECT INC.. (WASHBURN, JAMES)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME, re #3 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have until January 14, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. ( Answer due by 1/14/2022.) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/6/2022. (alb)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/19/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/18 /2022. Discovery due by 5/3/2022. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/5/2022. (alb)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by HAGGAR CLOTHING CO., HAGGAR DIRECT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (WASHBURN, JAMES)
January 5, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO.) (alb)
January 5, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #3 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. (alb) Modified on 1/5/2022 to reflect correct judge (alb).
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WASHBURN, JAMES)
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HAGGAR CLOTHING CO., HAGGAR DIRECT, INC. from FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, WALTON COUNTY, FL, case number 2021 CA 00449-CA. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6608524.), filed by HAGGAR CLOTHING CO., HAGGAR DIRECT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Proceedings, #2 Exhibit B - Partnership Registration Statement, #3 Exhibit C - FL Department of Corporations Printout, #4 Exhibit D - Business Entity Report of Simon Property Group, LP, #5 Exhibit E - Business Entity Report of Simon Property Group Inc., #6 Exhibit F - FL 2021 Annual Report, #7 Exhibit G - MCS Investments, Ltd. FL Filings, #8 Exhibit H - MCS Investments General Partner, Inc. FL Filing, #9 Exhibit I - Silver Sands Factory Stores, Ltd. FL Filing, #10 Exhibit J - Silver Sands Factory Stores General Partner, Inc. FL Filing, #11 Exhibit K - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (WASHBURN, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILVER SANDS JOINT VENTURE PARTNERSHIP v. HAGGAR DIRECT INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SILVER SANDS JOINT VENTURE PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: ROBERT CHRISTOPHER FOLLAND, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAGGAR DIRECT, INC.
Represented By: JAMES ANDREW WASHBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAGGAR CLOTHING CO.
Represented By: JAMES ANDREW WASHBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAGGAR DIRECT INC
Represented By: JAMES ANDREW WASHBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAGGAR CLOTHING CO
Represented By: JAMES ANDREW WASHBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?