RIBBING et al v. PENSACOLA INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT / ISS et al
Plaintiff: PATRICK ANTHONY RIBBING, ANTHONY LEE LINER and TO BE ANNOUNCED
Defendant: PENSACOLA INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT / ISS and PENSACOLA POLICE DEPARTMENT
Case Number: 3:2022cv00314
Filed: January 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (Objections not filed.) (jfj)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable sent to Patrick Anthony Ribbing containing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (Envelope labeled "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward".)(jfj) (jfj)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that: This action be dismissed sua sponte as malicious for Plaintiff's abuse of the judicial process. Injunctive sanctions be imposed on Plaintiff to the extent that the clerk is directed not to accept any future filings from Plaintiff unless he is represented by counsel or upon obtaining prior leave of court to proceed pro se. The clerk be directed to close the file. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 01/26/22. R&R flag set (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/23/2022.) (jfj)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is ORDERED that: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Doc. #2 ) is DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 01/26/22. (jfj)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (jfj)
January 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (jfj)
January 7, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY LEE LINER, PATRICK ANTHONY RIBBING. (jfj)
January 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENSACOLA INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT / ISS, PENSACOLA POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by PATRICK ANTHONY RIBBING, ANTHONY LEE LINER. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment) (No service copies. IFP motion received.) (jfj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIBBING et al v. PENSACOLA INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT / ISS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK ANTHONY RIBBING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY LEE LINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TO BE ANNOUNCED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENSACOLA INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT / ISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENSACOLA POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?