DESTIN ELKS LODGE #2688 v. WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Plaintiff: DESTIN ELKS LODGE #2688
Defendant: WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2022cv00331
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (mb)
February 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DESTIN ELKS LODGE #2688 (ROSS, VANESSA)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff's deadline to file its response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is extended fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (Response to motion due by 2/17/2022.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/3/2022. (mb)
February 2, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (mb)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DESTIN ELKS LODGE #2688. (ROSS, VANESSA)
January 25, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent SR Corporate Solutions America Holding Corporation for WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION.. (SMITH, CYRIL)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by DESTIN ELKS LODGE #2688. (ROSS, VANESSA)
January 18, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/1/2022). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit D. Robertson Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 to D. Robertson Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. A, #4 Exhibit Ex. B, #5 Exhibit Ex. C, #6 Exhibit Ex. D, #7 Exhibit Ex. E, #8 Exhibit Ex. F, #9 Exhibit Ex. G, #10 Exhibit Ex. H, #11 Exhibit Ex. I, #12 Exhibit Ex. J) (MCCORMACK, AIDAN)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/25/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/24/2022. Discovery due by 7/11/2022. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/11/2022. (mb)
January 11, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (mb)
January 10, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PHILLIPS, JOSEPH)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION from Circuit Court 1st Judicial Circuit Okaloosa County, case number 2021 CA 003827 F. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6619497.), filed by WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Of Notice Of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Remedy Notice) (PHILLIPS, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DESTIN ELKS LODGE #2688 v. WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DESTIN ELKS LODGE #2688
Represented By: VANESSA R ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTPORT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH TRUMON PHILLIPS
Represented By: AIDAN MIDDLEMISS MCCORMACK
Represented By: CYRIL ELLIOT SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?