RAMIREZ v. SANTIAGO et al
Defendant: SANTIAGO, SGT ANDERSON, MICHAOD, BORRELLI, DUNBAR, SGT NEELY, ANDERSON and NEELY
Petitioner: GUILLERMO RAMIREZ
Case Number: 3:2022cv00784
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must show cause, if any, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with an order of the court. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 03/03/22. (Show Cause Response due by 4/4/2022.) (jfj)
March 1, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #7 Order. Amended Complaint, Filing Fee or IFP motion due by 2/24/2022. (Neither Amended Complaint, Filing Fee, nor IFP motion received.) (jfj)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate approved for use in the Northern District. This case number should be written on the forms. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite prisoner consent form and financial certificate and a computer printout of the transactions in his inmate account for the preceding six-month period. Additionally, within that time, Plaintiff must file an amended civil rights complaint, which must be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court form, and titled "Amended Complaint." Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that the case be dismissed. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 01/25/22. (Amended Complaint due by 2/24/2022. Filing Fee or IFP motion due by 2/24/2022.)(Forms mailed as directed.) (jfj)
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (jfj)
January 24, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (jfj)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 5:22-cv-00010. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 20, 2022 Filing 4 TRANSFER to the District of Northern District of Florida. (LMF) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/21/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to Northern District. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 1/18/2022. (KLM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/21/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/11/2022. (LAB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/21/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anderson, Borrelli, Dunbar, Michaod, Neely, Santiago filed by Guillermo Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SPM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/21/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMIREZ v. SANTIAGO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GUILLERMO RAMIREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORRELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUNBAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT NEELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?