BOYINGTON v. DIXON
Petitioner: KEVIN LEE BOYINGTON
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA and RICKY D DIXON
Case Number: 3:2022cv00824
Filed: January 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The clerk of the court shall change the docket to reflect that the Respondent in this action is Ricky D. Dixon, Secretary of the Florida Department of Corrections. On or before 3/25/2022, Petitioner shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with an order of this court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 3/11/2022. (jcw)
February 15, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #5 FIRST AMENDED PETITION UNDER 28 USC 2254 filed by KEVIN LEE BOYINGTON. (no service copies received) (jfj)
February 14, 2022 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED PETITION UNDER 28 USC 2254 filed by KEVIN LEE BOYINGTON.(no service copies received) (jfj)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 Habeas Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number FLN3-15147. Fee status updated to paid. (mb)
January 27, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: 4 Habeas Filing Fee Received. (mb)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The clerk of court shall forward to Petitioner a 2254 form and a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number shall be written on the forms. On or before 2/25/2022, Petitioner shall file an amended petition, which shall be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court form, and accompanied by two identical service copies of same. WITHIN THE SAME TIME, Petitioner shall submit payment in the amount of $5.00, or file a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (IFP/Fee due by 2/25/2022.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 1/26/2022. (jcw)(Form sent as ordered.)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
January 25, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jcw)
January 24, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by KEVIN LEE BOYINGTON. (Filing fee was not paid. 2 service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOYINGTON v. DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KEVIN LEE BOYINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RICKY D DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?