DODSON et al v. WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC et al
Plaintiff: SCOTT DODSON, ANGELINE DODSON, ROBERT DAVIS, CATHY DAVIS, RAYMOND NEFF and CARRIE NEFF
Defendant: Westervelt Ecological Services, LLC, MUNROE FOREST & WILDLIFE MANAGEMENT, INC., WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC and MUNROE FOREST & WILDLIFE MANAGEMENT INC
3Rd Party Defendant: CHILDS LAND CLEARING, LLC and CHILDS LAND CLEARING LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv04470
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Filing 17 Plaintiffs' Objection to the Affidavit of Ray F. Robbins, III, Filed in Support of Defendant Westervelt Ecological Services, LLC's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by ANGELINE DODSON, ROBERT DAVIS, RAYMOND NEFF, CATHY DAVIS, CARRIE NEFF, SCOTT DODSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit May 10th,2022 E-mail from Jack Bethay) (HANCOCK, BRIAN) Modified on 5/13/2022 to edit title (jcw).
May 6, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #7 First MOTION to Remand, #16 Response in Opposition to Motion. (jcw)
May 5, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 First MOTION to Remand and Award Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Fact Defendant Westervelt's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and for Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (BETHAY, JOHN)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING EXTENSION OF TIME. re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 7 First MOTION to Remand and Award Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 04/27/2022. (alb)
April 27, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #14 Response in Opposition to #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 First MOTION to Remand and Award Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Fact. (alb)
April 26, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 First MOTION to Remand and Award Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Fact filed by CATHY DAVIS, ROBERT DAVIS, ANGELINE DODSON, SCOTT DODSON, CARRIE NEFF, RAYMOND NEFF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 03 30 2022 Email to Westervelt Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - 04 07 2022 Email from Westervelt Counsel) (HANCOCK, BRIAN)
April 26, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 First MOTION to Remand and Award Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Fact by WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC. (WHITE, FRED)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED, and attorneys John D. Bethay, III, and Thomas Buck, Jr. are authorized to appear pro hac vice for Defendant Westervelt Ecological Services, LLC. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 4/26/2022. (jcw)
April 26, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Douglas Bethay III.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6955090.), #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Buck Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6955512.) (jcw)
April 26, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 First MOTION to Remand and Award Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Fact (jcw)
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Buck Jr..( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6955512.) by WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BUCK, THOMAS)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Douglas Bethay III.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6955090.) by WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BETHAY, JOHN)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TOLLING DEADLINES re #8 Motion to Stay. The motion is GRANTED, and all deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order are tolled pending disposition of Plaintiffs motion to remand. If the motion to remand is denied, the parties shall have 14 days from the date the Court rules on the motion to hold their Rule 26(f) conference and 7 days after the conference to file their joint report and proposed scheduling order. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 4/22/2022. (jcw)
April 21, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 First MOTION to Remand and Award Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Fact. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/5/2022). (jcw)
April 21, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Initial Scheduling Order (Unopposed) by CATHY DAVIS, ROBERT DAVIS, ANGELINE DODSON, SCOTT DODSON, CARRIE NEFF, RAYMOND NEFF. (HANCOCK, BRIAN)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION to Remand and Award Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Fact by CATHY DAVIS, ROBERT DAVIS, ANGELINE DODSON, SCOTT DODSON, CARRIE NEFF, RAYMOND NEFF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11.18.20 Email and Excel Sheet, #2 Exhibit Pls Motion for Leave to Amend Class Action Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3.30.22 Email from BDH to OC, #4 Exhibit 3.31.22 Email from BDH to OC, #5 Exhibit 4.6.22 Emails between BDH and Bethay) (HANCOCK, BRIAN)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TOLLING DEADLINE - ORDERED that the deadline established in the ISO for Defendants response to Plaintiffs' amended motion for class certification is tolled pending further order, and the parties shall include a proposed schedule for conducting any necessary class discovery and briefing the amended motion in their Rule 26(f) report. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/29/2022. (jcw)
March 29, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition or, in the Alternative, for an Emergency Scheduling Conference. (jcw)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition or, in the Alternative, for an Emergency Scheduling Conference by WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC. (KEELEY, BRENDAN)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CHILDS LAND CLEARING LLC. (SPEAR, GARY)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/7/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/9/2022. Discovery due by 7/21/2022. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/24/2022. (jcw)
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Westervelt Company, Inc. for WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC.. (WHITE, FRED)
March 23, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (Please see proposed ISO.) (alb)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westervelt Ecological Services, LLC from First Judicial Circuit in and for Santa Rosa County, Florida, case number 2020-CA-000274. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6849174.), filed by Westervelt Ecological Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Summons to Munroe, #4 Summons to Westervelt, #5 Return of Service (Westervelt), #6 Return of Service (Munroe), #7 Order Denying Motions to Dismiss, #8 Munroe's Answer, Aff Defenses and 3rd Party Complaint, #9 Westervelt's Answer and Aff Defenses, #10 Munroe's NOF Exhibits to 3rd Party Complaint, #11 Summons to Childs Land Clearing, #12 Plaintiff's Reply to Munroe's Aff Defenses, #13 Plaintiffs' Reply to Westervelt's Affirmative Defenses, #14 Return of Service (Childs), #15 Childs' Answer and Aff Defenses to Munroe's 3rd Party Complaint, #16 Munroe's Reply to Childs' Aff Defenses, #17 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #18 Munroe's Answer and Aff Defenses to Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Complaint, #19 Order Granting Munroe's Motion to Amend 3rd Party Complaint, #20 Westervelt's Answer and Aff Defenses to Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Complaint, #21 Munroe's Amended Answer and Aff Defenses to Plaintiffs' 1st Amended Complaint, #22 Childs' Answer and Aff Defenses to Munroe's Amended 3rd Party Complaint, #23 Order to Plaintiffs' Regarding Required Reporting, #24 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #25 Order Granting Child's Motion for Substitution of Counsel, #26 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Certify Class, #27 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification) (WHITE, FRED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DODSON et al v. WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT DODSON
Represented By: BRIAN DOUGLAS HANCOCK
Represented By: J PHILLIP WARREN
Represented By: KEITH WILLIAM WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELINE DODSON
Represented By: BRIAN DOUGLAS HANCOCK
Represented By: J PHILLIP WARREN
Represented By: KEITH WILLIAM WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DAVIS
Represented By: BRIAN DOUGLAS HANCOCK
Represented By: J PHILLIP WARREN
Represented By: KEITH WILLIAM WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY DAVIS
Represented By: BRIAN DOUGLAS HANCOCK
Represented By: J PHILLIP WARREN
Represented By: KEITH WILLIAM WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND NEFF
Represented By: BRIAN DOUGLAS HANCOCK
Represented By: J PHILLIP WARREN
Represented By: KEITH WILLIAM WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIE NEFF
Represented By: BRIAN DOUGLAS HANCOCK
Represented By: J PHILLIP WARREN
Represented By: KEITH WILLIAM WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westervelt Ecological Services, LLC
Represented By: FRED PERSHING WHITE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNROE FOREST & WILDLIFE MANAGEMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERVELT ECOLOGICAL SERVICES LLC
Represented By: BRENDAN N KEELEY
Represented By: JOHN DOUGLAS BETHAY, III
Represented By: THOMAS W H BUCK, JR
Represented By: FRED PERSHING WHITE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNROE FOREST & WILDLIFE MANAGEMENT INC
Represented By: DANIEL J SANTANIELLO
Represented By: SEAN JOSEPH FISHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CHILDS LAND CLEARING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CHILDS LAND CLEARING LLC
Represented By: GARY RANDALL SPEAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?