DELICES v. MARLIN et al
Plaintiff: VILES DELICES
Defendant: J MARLIN, LATOYA BROWN, PRESTON TUCKER and SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ANNEX
Case Number: 3:2022cv05051
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
2 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 Filing 8 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 15.43, receipt number FLN300015403. Fee status updated to paid. (alb)
May 25, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: 8 Initial Partial Filing Fee Received. (alb)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/23/2022. (lsd) **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:22cv5051-MCR-ZCB.
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff has shown good cause for the extension; therefore, the deadline to pay the initial partial filing fee is extended to JUNE 15, 2022. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 05/17/2022. (jmw)
May 17, 2022 Set Deadlines re 6 ORDER. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 6/15/2022). (Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff). (mb)
May 16, 2022 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Extend the Time to Pay the Partial Prepayment Filing Fee, by VILES DELICES. (mb)
May 16, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Extend the Time to Pay the Partial Prepayment Filing Fee. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (mb)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS for VILES DELICES re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by VILES DELICES. The clerk of court is directed to assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $15.43 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The clerk of court is directed to mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to the Florida Department of Corrections. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 5/16/2022.) (Cover Letter w/ORDER sent to FDOC). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/14/2022. (mb)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, VILES DELICES. (mb)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VILES DELICES. (mb)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LATOYA BROWN, J MARLIN, SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ANNEX, PRESTON TUCKER, filed by VILES DELICES. (No service copies). (mb)
April 12, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint (No service copies), #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DELICES v. MARLIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILES DELICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J MARLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATOYA BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESTON TUCKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA ROSA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ANNEX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?