CROWELL v. SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Petitioner: TONISHA CROWELL
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and ATTORNEY GENERAL STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 3:2022cv09193
Filed: July 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 5:22-cv-00276. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 5, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court, Northern District of Florida, Pensacola Division for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/30/2022. (GNB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/5/2022.]
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 6/17/2022. (RLK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/5/2022.]
June 16, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Tonisha Crowell. (RLK) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/5/2022.]
June 16, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tonisha Crowell. (no service copies provided)(RLK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROWELL v. SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TONISHA CROWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?