KITT v. DIXON
Petitioner: DEONTREZ L KITT
Respondent: RICKY DIXON
Case Number: 3:2022cv17819
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus The clerk shall serve a copy of the petition, ECF Doc. #1 , and this Order to Respondent and to the Attorney General of the State of Florida. Respondent shall have ninety days from the date this Order is entered on the docket in which to respond to the petition as directed by this Order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 11/10/2022.(Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/8/2023). (Documents sent via certified mail.) (alb)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #6 Order to Show Cause. Clerk received 2 additional service copies of Petition. (alb)
November 9, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: 7 Docket Annotation. Clerk received 2 additional service copies of Petition. (alb)
November 9, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #8 Response to Order to Show Cause. (alb)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER, by DEONTREZ L KITT. (alb)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Petitioner shall have fourteen days from the date of this Order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply and failure to prosecute. The Court will discharge the show cause order if Petitioner complies with the Court's September 15, 2022, Order within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/25/2022. Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2022. (alb)
October 19, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: 5 Docket Annotation: clerk received one service copy. (alb)
October 4, 2022 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #3 Order. (Clerk received only one service copy of Petition.) (alb)
September 27, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: 4 Filing Fee Received only. Deadline remains for service copies. (alb)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number FLN300015660. Fee status updated to paid. (alb)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk shall send Petitioner a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number shall be written on the form. Within thirty days from the date of this order, Petitioner shall either pay the $5.00 filing fee or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within the same time, Petitioner shall provide to the Court two (2) identical service copies of the petition or payment in the amount of $.50 per page to the clerk for the cost of twice copying the petition ($19.00 total). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 09/15/2022. ( Fee due by 10/15/2022.) (Order and form mailed.) (alb)
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DEONTREZ L KITT. (No service copies, no IFP motion or fee received.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (alb)
September 13, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KITT v. DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DEONTREZ L KITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RICKY DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?