DAVIS v. JOSEPH et al
Petitioner: CURTIS ALLEN DAVIS
Respondent: M V JOSEPH, E MAMULA and J GIGNILLIAT
Case Number: 3:2023cv03952
Filed: February 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MIDORI A LOWRY
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LENNARD B REGISTER, III on behalf of M V JOSEPH (REGISTER, LENNARD)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO #2 2241 PETITION. (US Attorney's response due on or before: 4/17/2023)., Petitioner's replies due no later than 5/18/2023). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY on 2/16/2023. The clerk of court is directed to forward a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #2 ) and this order to Respondent and the United States Attorney for this District (kdm) (Mailed as directed above.)
February 16, 2023 Filing 4 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: CURTIS ALLEN DAVIS, FPC PENSACOLA, P O BOX 3949, PENSACOLA, FL 32509. (kdm)
February 16, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY notified that action is needed Re: 3 Habeas Corpus Filing fee Received, #2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Two (2) service copies received, fee paid, no motion for IFP received). (kdm)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MIDORI A LOWRY for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/15/2022. (sjb) ( Please use judge's new initials for future filings: 3:23cv3952-MCR/MAL)
February 13, 2023 Filing 3 Habeas Corpus Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 4-46059. Fee status updated to paid. (kdm)
February 13, 2023 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CURTIS ALLEN DAVIS. (Two (2) service copies received, fee paid, no motion for IFP received.) (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. JOSEPH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CURTIS ALLEN DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M V JOSEPH
Represented By: LENNARD B REGISTER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E MAMULA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J GIGNILLIAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?