MEYERS et al v. BROWN et al
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MEYERS and TAMMY GODMAN
Defendant: JEFFREY BROWN, BRADLEY BROWN, RUSSELL HUTCHINSON, ADAM MEDLEY, ALLY BANK, ALLY BANK CORP, ALLY FINANCIAL INC, ALLY SERVICING INC and XTREME RECOVERY LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00028
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs seek a 30-day extension of time to submit an amended complaint. Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' amended complaint is now due March 20, 2024. Further extensions of time will not be granted. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 2/23/2024. (mb)
February 23, 2024 Set Deadlines re #6 ORDER. (Amended COMPLAINT due by 3/20/2024). (mb)
February 22, 2024 Filing 5 Notice/Request of MOTION to Extend Time, by TAMMY GODMAN. (mb)
February 22, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice/Request of MOTION to Extend Time. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (mb)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiffs' complaint (Doc. #1 ) is STRICKEN as an impermissible shotgun pleading. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, Plaintiffs must file an amended complaint on a Court-approved complaint form and mark it "Amended Complaint." Alternatively, Plaintiffs may file a notice of voluntary dismissal within the same time. (Amended COMPLAINT due by 2/19/2024.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 2/5/2024. (mb)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, JUSTIN MEYERS and TAMMY GODMAN. (mb)
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number DFLN3-701. Fee status updated to paid. (mb)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALLY BANK, ALLY BANK CORP, ALLY FINANCIAL INC, ALLY SERVICING INC, BRADLEY BROWN, JEFFREY BROWN, RUSSELL HUTCHINSON, ADAM MEDLEY, XTREME RECOVERY LLC (Filing fee $405), filed by TAMMY GODMAN, JUSTIN MEYERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - M (Exhibit M is a DVD disc) (No service copies). (mb)
January 18, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (No service copies). (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEYERS et al v. BROWN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN MEYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY GODMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADLEY BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSELL HUTCHINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM MEDLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLY BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLY BANK CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLY FINANCIAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLY SERVICING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XTREME RECOVERY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?