PRICE v. 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD GARY PRICE
Defendant: 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00089
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2024 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by RICHARD GARY PRICE. (djb) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/19/2024) (djb). Modified on 3/19/2024 to remove certified mail receipt (djb).
March 19, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Response to Order to Show Cause, re: #4 Order to Show Cause (djb)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Price is required to show cause for why his case should not be dismissed on statute of limitations grounds. Price must file his response within 14 days from the date of this Order. Within 30 days from the date of this Order, Price must serve on Defense Counsel a signed affidavit providing the following information: (see order). Price's failure to strictly comply with this Order, and more generally the requirements of CMO 57, will result in dismissal of his case with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/6/2024. Show Cause Response due by 3/20/2024. (djb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2024: #1 Exhibit CMO NO. 57) (djb).
March 4, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: Received Filing Fee for Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) Case (djb)
March 4, 2024 Payment of Filing Fee (Receipt #300000798, Filing fee $405.), filed by RICHARD GARY PRICE. (djb) Modified on 3/4/2024 to enter receipt number (djb).
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have until March 6, 2024, to pay the $405 filing fee. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 2/28/2024. (djb)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD GARY PRICE. (djb)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, filed by RICHARD GARY PRICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (djb)
February 28, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (djb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRICE v. 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD GARY PRICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO HOLDING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?