MATHEWS v. DIXON et al
Plaintiff: CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS
Defendant: RICKY DIXON, DONALD LEAVINS and J STREEIT
Case Number: 3:2024cv00108
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2024 Filing 7 Objection and Response to Court's #4 Report and Recommendations, by CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS. (alb)
April 17, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #7 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (alb)
March 25, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Class Certification by CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS. (mb)
March 25, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS. (mb)
March 25, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 MOTION for Class Certification, #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (mb)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - That this case be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). That the clerk close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 3/20/2024. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/17/2024. (mb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS. (mb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 2 PRISONER CONSENT FORM & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE, by CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS. (mb)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS, RICKY DIXON, DONALD LEAVINS, filed by CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Court of "Imminent Danger") (No service copies). (mb)
March 11, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Court of "Imminent Danger") (No service copies). #2 Prisoner Consent Form & Financial Certificate. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MATHEWS v. DIXON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLTON XAVIER MATHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICKY DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD LEAVINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J STREEIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?