WRIGHT v. LINER et al
Plaintiff: DARIAN MAURICE WRIGHT
Defendant: CHRISTIAN LINER and R QUINN
Case Number: 3:2024cv00279
Filed: June 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
June 18, 2024 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:24-cv-01316. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 18, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
June 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida, Pensacola Division, for all further proceedings. The clerk must close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/14/2024. (RO) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/18/2024.]
June 12, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Darian Maurice Wright. (CTR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/18/2024.]
June 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christian Liner, R. Quinn filed by Darian Maurice Wright. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) Modified attachment description on 6/13/2024 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 6/18/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT v. LINER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARIAN MAURICE WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN LINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R QUINN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?