DAMIAN v. BROMELL INVESTMENTS LLC et al
Plaintiff: MELANIE E DAMIAN
Defendant: BROMELL INVESTMENTS LLC and THIRTEEN TWENTY TWO INVESTMENTS LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00601
Filed: November 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: T KENT WETHERELL
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO QUASH SERVICE re (Docs. #7 , #8 ). That Mrs. Bromell's motions to quash service (Docs. #7 , #8 ) are DENIED. Defendants have 21 days from the date of this Order to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1 ). (All Defendants Answer/Response due by 2/13/2025). Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 01/23/2025. (mah)
January 22, 2025 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #9 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint by Special Appearance and Memorandum, #8 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint by Special Appearance and Memorandum Plaintiff's Respo nse in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Quash Service of Summonses and Complaint. (mb)
January 21, 2025 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint by Special Appearance and Memorandum, #8 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint by Special Appearance and Memorandum Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Quash Service of Summonses and Complaints filed by MELANIE E DAMIAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (MURENA, KENNETH)
January 8, 2025 Set Deadlines re #7 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint by Special Appearance and Memorandum and #8 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint by Special Appearance and Memorandum. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/22/2025). (mb)
January 8, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint by Special Appearance and Memorandum by Alexandria Bromell. (WIAND, BURTON)
January 8, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint by Special Appearance and Memorandum by Alexandria Bromell. (WIAND, BURTON)
December 27, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELANIE E DAMIAN. THIRTEEN TWENTY TWO INVESTMENTS LLC served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025. (MURENA, KENNETH)
December 27, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MELANIE E DAMIAN. BROMELL INVESTMENTS LLC served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025. (MURENA, KENNETH)
December 4, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BROMELL INVESTMENTS LLC, (Attachments: #1 THIRTEEN TWENTY TWO INVESTMENTS LLC). (mb)
December 3, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summonses by MELANIE E DAMIAN (Attachments: #1 proposed Summons- Bromell Investments LLC, #2 proposed Summons- Thirteen Twenty Two Investments LLC) (MURENA, KENNETH)
November 27, 2024 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference, please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (mah)
November 26, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-9152277.), filed by Melanie E. Damian, as Receiver of Highrise Advantage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (MURENA, KENNETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAMIAN v. BROMELL INVESTMENTS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELANIE E DAMIAN
Represented By: KENNETH DANTE MURENA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROMELL INVESTMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THIRTEEN TWENTY TWO INVESTMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?