LYONS v. MCDONOUGH
Plaintiff: KEVIN LYONS
Defendant: JAMES MCDONOUGH
Case Number: 4:2007cv00369
Filed: August 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING 31 Report and Recommendation, 8 Petitioner's amended 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 6/16/09. (atm)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY 2254 PETITION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by KEVIN LYONS : It is RECOMMENDED that 28 U.S.C. § 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus filed by Petitioner Lyons, challenging the judgment and sentences of life and 30 years imposed by the Circuit Court of the Third Judicial Circuit, in and for Madison County, Florida, case number 2001-119-CF, be DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 6/10/2009. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 05/13/09. (dlt)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PROTECTIVE ORDER and File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 1/7/2008. (jws)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JAMES MCDONOUGH - DENIED. ( Answer due by 1/5/2009.) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 12/4/2008. (jws)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JAMES MCDONOUGH :It is RECOMMENDED that Respondent's motion to dismiss, doc. 12 ,be DENIED and, given the delay caused by this motion, that Respondent be ordered to file an answer within 15 days from the date the court enters the order adopting thisreport and recommendation. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/11/2008.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 11/13/08. (dlt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LYONS v. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN LYONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?