PARKS v. MCNEIL
Defendant: WALTER A MCNEIL
Petitioner: ROOSEVELT PARKS
Case Number: 4:2007cv00493
Filed: November 26, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Wakulla
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM STAFFORD
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Report and Recommendation 47 is ADOPTED and incorporated by reference into this order. The petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus doc. 1 is DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 08/25/09. (dlt)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition for writ of habeas corpus 1 , challenging the recalculation of Mr. Parks' release date be DENIED, that this cause be DISMISSED, and that the clerk be directed to close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on 8/10/09. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/7/2009. (lcu)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The petitioner's "Motion of Action" construed as a motion for relief from judgment under Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure doc. 20 is GRANTED. The co urt's order and judgment (docs. 18 & 19 ) docketed June 25, 2008, are VACATED and SET ASIDE. The clerk shall reopen the case and shall refer it to the magistrate judge forfurther proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 11/12/08. (dlt)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re 19 Clerk's Judgment, 18 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, filed by ROOSEVELT PARKS: It is recommended 1. That petitioner's "Motion o f Action", construed as a Motion for Relief from Judgment, be GRANTED to extent that judgment be vacated and this case re-opened. 2. That judgment 19 be VACATED. 3. That clerk be directed to re-open this case. 4. That the matter be referred to undersigned for further proceedings. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/17/2008. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on October 20, 2008.(cc: Parks) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PARKS v. MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROOSEVELT PARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER A MCNEIL
Represented By: SHERON LEE WELLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?