GREEN HARRIS v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: DENA GREEN HARRIS
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 4:2008cv00280
Filed: June 20, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Attorney Fees for Attorney Heather Freeman. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 5/6/09. (bkp)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 20 Report and Recommendation. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 4/27/2009. The decision of the Commissioner to deny Plaintiffs application for Social Security benefits is reversed and t his case is remanded to supplementand update Plaintiffs medical records, to obtain evidence from a rheumatology as to whether Plaintiff has fibromyalgia or a similar disease, and to what extent her condition has an effect upon her residual functional capacity, to redetermine her residual functional capacity, and to correct the problems identified with respect to the questions posted to the vocational expert. (kdm)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, re 1 Complaint filed by DENA GREEN HARRIS: It is RECOMMENDED that the decision of the Commissioner to deny Plaintiff's application for Social Security benefits be REVERSED and the case be REMANDED to supplement and update Plaintiff's medical records, to obtain evidence from a rheumatologist as to whether Plaintiff has fibromyalgia or a similar disease, and to what extent her condition has an effect upon her residual functional capacity, t o redetermine her residual functional capacity, and to correct the problems identified above with respect to the questions posed to the vocational expert. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 03/26/2009. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/23/2009.) (krb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN HARRIS v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENA GREEN HARRIS
Represented By: HEATHER F ALOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?