LEWIS v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: MARILYN Y LEWIS
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 4:2008cv00441
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: ROBERT L HINKLE
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES - The Report and Recommendation 29 is ACCEPTED and adopted as the court's opinion; Granting 25 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/11/2011. (dlt)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COST - The Report and Recommendation 23 is ACCEPTED and adopted as the court's opinion. GRANTING 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. The Secretary must pay to the plaintiff's attorney Charles Lee Martin the sum of $5,154.43 as attorneys fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act and $350.00 as costs for a total of $5,504.43. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 02/4/2010. (dlt)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - It is RECOMMENDED that: Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees doc. 19 be GRANTED and the court order that the Secretary certify and pay to Plaintiff's counsel $5,154.433 as a reasonable at torney fee and reimburse Plaintiff's counsel $350.00 for the filing fee. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/1/2010. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 01/04/2010. (dlt)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REVERSING DENIAL OF BENEFITS AND REMANDING FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - The Report and Recommendation 16 is ACCEPTED and adopted as the courts opinion. The Commissioners decision denying the plaintiffs application for disability benefits is REVERSED.The case is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the report and recommendation and this order. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/06/09. (dlt)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by MARILYN Y LEWIS :It is RECOMMENDED that the decision of the Commissioner to deny Plaintiff's application for Social Security benefits be REVERSED and the case be REMANDED to directly consider the mental health evidence, determine Plaintiff's residual functional capacity after consider that evidence, make explicit findings regarding the actual physical and mental demands of Plaintiff's past work (step 4) or othe r work in the national economy (step 5, if needed), and compare the actual demands of such work with Plaintiff's residual functional capacity. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 08/13/09. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/10/2009. (dlt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARILYN Y LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?