BROCKMAN v. TOYS "R" US - DELAWARE, INC.
Plaintiff: CAFFIE BROCKMAN
Defendant: TOYS "R" US - DELAWARE, INC.
Case Number: 4:2009cv00280
Filed: July 30, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Pla's request for appointed counsel is denied. This case is dismissed w/o prejudice. Deft's MOTION for Summary Judgment 51 is denied as moot. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/3/2010. (sea)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER 51 Dft's MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Response to motion due by by 5/28/2010.) Trial remains scheduled for 7/26/10 at 8:30 a.m. in Tallahassee, FL. Pretrial conference remains scheduled for 7/22/10 at 9:30 a.m. in Panama City, FL. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve this Order on Pla at 126 Hicks Rd, Lamont, FL 32336, as soon as possible. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/18/2010. (sea)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER 64 Order to Show Cause is withdrawn. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 4/26/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROCKMAN v. TOYS "R" US - DELAWARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAFFIE BROCKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYS "R" US - DELAWARE, INC.
Represented By: B TYLER WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?