JOHNSON v. DEMARAIS
Petitioner: RICHARD L JOHNSON
Respondent: BRAIN DEMARAIS
Case Number: 4:2010cv00498
Filed: November 9, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and granting 31 Motion to Dismiss filed by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/8/12. (tss)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER directing Clerk to send blank state prisoner habeas corpus form - Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2011; signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/4/11 (form mailed to Petitioner) (tss)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by RICHARD L JOHNSON and directing Petitioner to file an Amended Petition with 2 service copies - Amended Pleadings due by 5/19/2011; signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/19/11(blank habeas corpus form fowarded to Petitioner) (tss)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER rejecting 12 Report and Recommendation and referring the case to the Magistrate Judge; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 4/15/11. (tss)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 9 Motion (Writ) to Compel filed by RICHARD L JOHNSON. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 2/18/2011. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. DEMARAIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICHARD L JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BRAIN DEMARAIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?