JOSEPH V GORMAN
Plaintiff: JEAN E JOSEPH
Defendant: WALTER MCNEIL, R GORMAN and J MURPHY
Case Number: 4:2011cv00034
Filed: January 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM C SHERRILL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ADOPTING 100 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: granting Def's 86 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying as moot Pla's 102 Request for Trial. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 9/27/2013. (jws)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: Clerk to re-mail Plaintiff copies of 88 , 92 , 95 Orders. Plaintiff shall file his opposition to Defendant's 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall immediately file a notice of address change. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/1/2013) or Notify Chambers on 3/1/2013.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/6/2013. (jws) (Copies provided as noted in order.)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ADOPTING 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant. Plaintiff's equal protection and Fourth Amendment claims are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, claim against defendant in his official capacity is DISMISSED due to the Eleventh Amendment, but otherwise, the motion is DENIED. Case is REMANDED to magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/17/2012. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOSEPH V GORMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R GORMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEAN E JOSEPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?