THOMAS v. BUSS
Plaintiff: DERREL THOMAS, JR
Defendant: BUSS and JORAM PEREZ
Case Number: 4:2011cv00046
Filed: January 31, 2011
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 50 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss filed by BOCCACCIO, JORAM PEREZ, BRADSHAW - Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing case w/prejudice each party to bear its own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/6/2012. (jws)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 39 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DERREL THOMAS, JR is GRANTED. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/9/2012).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/16/2012. (jws)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 Summons Returned Unexecuted. Plaintiff shall provide an address for Defendant, JORAM PEREZ to the Clerk of Court. (Miscellaneous Deadline - by 2/17/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/31/2012. (jws)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 17 Amended Complaint filed by BRADSHAW. (Answer/Response due by 2/28/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/12/2012. (jws)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 27 NOTICE by DOC as to Service on Defendant, JORAM PEREZ: Clerk directed to prepare USM-285 and USMS-1 waiver of service forms. Defendant, JORAM PEREZ shall have 30 days after service to file a response to complaint. (Notify Chambers on 3/12/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/11/2012. (Forwarded to USMS forms per order.) (jws)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 Amended Complaint, by BOCCACCIO, BOCCACCIO answer due 2/28/2012.( Answer due by 2/28/2012. Motions due by 2/28/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/29/11. (bkp)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 17 First Amended Complaint filed by DERREL THOMAS, JR - Clerk directed to issue summonses for JORAM PEREZ and BRADSHAW. Perez documents to Alexandria Walters, Florida Deputy General Counsel to obtain confidential addr ess of Defendant for USMS. Bradshaw documents via USMS to Darlene Lumpkin or Claudene Hall specially appointed to serve Defendant at Jefferson CI. Defendants' responses due w/n 60 days of service. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/20/2011. (Forwarded to USMS & Deputy General Counsel for processing: issued summons, service copies of 17 , and this order) (jws)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint filed by DERREL THOMAS, JR. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 11/1/2011. (jws)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff shall either pay the partial initial filing fee of $17.89 or advise the Court in writing why unable to pay the fee. (Fee due by 9/23/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/8/2011. (jws)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by DERREL THOMAS, JR. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/18/2011. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. BUSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORAM PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERREL THOMAS, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?