SHAW v. SCOGGINS et al
Plaintiff: DAVID WILLIAM SHAW
Defendant: AARON SCOGGINS, C GLAVEY and C PRICE
Case Number: 4:2016cv00549
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Wakulla
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING THIRD REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The 102 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted, over Plaintiff's objections, as this Court's opinion. The Defendants' motion for summary judgment, ECF No. 92 , is DENIED. This case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings prior to setting the case for trial. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/4/2019. (cle)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 82 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Defendant's motion to dismiss, ECF No. 74 , is DENIED. This case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/7/2018. (tdl)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment as to Defendant Price, ECF No. 42 , is DE NIED. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment against Defendant Scoggins, ECF No. 47 , is DENIED. Defendant Price's motion to set aside the Clerk's default, ECF No. 52 , is GRANTED. Defendant Scoggins' motion to set aside the Clerk's default, ECF No. 65 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Price and Scoggins shall file their responsive pleadings to the Complaint on or before 9/11/2017. This case is REMANDED to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/31/2017. (cle)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAW v. SCOGGINS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID WILLIAM SHAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON SCOGGINS
Represented By: GREGG A TOOMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C GLAVEY
Represented By: GREGG A TOOMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C PRICE
Represented By: GREGG A TOOMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?