HENRY v. UNKNOWN et al
Plaintiff: HENRY and MAURICE HENRY
Defendant: UNKNOWN, SAMUEL MASON and P BENTON
Case Number: 4:2017cv00011
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR***ORDER, ($9.10 Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 5/9/2017. Notify Chambers on 5/9/2017). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 5/1/2017. (vkm) Modified on 5/2/2017 (vkm).
April 3, 2017 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to #10 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 7/3/2017 (vkm)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ACCEPTING #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "This case is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court orders." The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/3/2017. (vkm)
March 31, 2017 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations by MAURICE HENRY. (vkm)
March 29, 2017 Filing 8 OBJECTION (filed as Petition for Review of Indigency) to #7 Report and Recommendations by MAURICE HENRY. (vkm)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint - It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court orders. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/23/2017. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/20/2017. (vkm)
March 22, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Order - Initial partial filing fee not received. (vkm)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order **Duplicate - ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/7/2017. (erl)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Plaintiff's notice, ECF No. #5 , is construed as a motion for an extension of time and is GRANTED. (Initial Partial Filing Fee of $3.20 due by 3/10/2017.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/7/2017. (tdl)
February 6, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Prisoner Consent Form & Financial Certificate. (tdl)
February 3, 2017 Filing 5 **CONSTRUED as MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME per #6 ORDER**PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MAURICE HENRY. (tdl) Modified on 2/8/2017 (tdl).
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - The in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff is not required to prepay the $350.00 filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall mail this Order with an appropriate cover letter to the Department of Corrections. The Clerk of Court shall provide Plaintiff with a copy of thePrisoner Consent Form ($3.20 Initial Partial Filing Fee/Prisoner Consent Form due by 2/10/2017. Notify Chambers on 2/10/2017). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/10/2017. (vkm)***ORDER MAILED TO DOC AS DIRECTED; FORM PROVIDED TO PLAINTIFF AS DIRECTED***
January 9, 2017 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se. (vkm)
January 9, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (vkm)
January 6, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MAURICE HENRY. (vkm)
January 6, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against P BENTON, SAMUEL MASON, UNKNOWN, filed by MAURICE HENRY. (vkm)***NO SERVICE COPIES PROVIDED***

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENRY v. UNKNOWN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL MASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P BENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURICE HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?